judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANK J. GROSSO V. DC POLICE & FIRE RETIRE BD.

Case Information: 11-AA-0256
Short Caption:FRANK J. GROSSO V. DC POLICE & FIRE RETIRE BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PD1123-07Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/01/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerFrank J. Grosso N
Robert C. SeldonYN
RespondentD.C. Police & Firefighters' Retirement & Relief BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/04/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/07/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
04/25/2012FiledRecord On Appeal w/ cd
04/25/2012FiledRecord Completed
05/02/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/30/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
06/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 7/11/12
06/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (2 weeks) Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
07/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (2 weeks) Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 7/25/12
07/25/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record or to vacate the Board's decision and to remand for a new hearing (Petitioner)
07/25/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
07/25/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
08/28/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion To Supplement The Record or to vacate the Board's decision and to remand for a new hearing (Petitioner)
08/28/2012FiledMotion To Remand (Respondent)Granted
08/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File in the event that this court denies respondent's motion to remand Brief (Respondent)Denied as Moot
09/06/2012FiledOpposition to respondent's motion to remand (Petitioner)
09/14/2012FiledReply to Petitioner's response to motion to remand. (Respondent)
10/01/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Remand (Respondent)
10/01/2012FiledRemanded
10/01/2012FiledMandate
10/09/2012FiledMotion for clarification of order of 10/1/12 (Petitioner)Denied Without Prejudice
10/12/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Petitioner)Denied Without Prejudice
10/19/2012FiledAnswer/Response to motions to recall mandate and for clarification (Respondent)
10/23/2012FiledReply to respndent's response to motion to recall the mandate and for clarification (Petitioner)
11/01/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION//MOTION TO REMAND//OPPO//REPLY
11/19/2012FiledORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTIONS FOR CLARIFICATIONS and TO RECALL the MANDATE
09/24/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From Robert C. Seldon