judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GENE LOCK, ET AL. v. STATE OF TEXAS

Case: B-2860
B-2860
07/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
GENE LOCK, ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/04/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/30/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/28/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/19/1971Response to Motion filed
11/04/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/30/1971Reply to Response
07/28/1971Response to Petition
07/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/14/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gene Lock, et al.Petitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information