judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL SINDRAM V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH CARE FINANCE

Case Information: 11-AA-0257
Short Caption:MICHAEL SINDRAM V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH CARE FINANCEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHCF00099-10Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMichael Sindram NPro SeN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Dep't of Health Care FinanceN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY).
03/04/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/17/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED ON APPEAL IFP IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
03/17/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER shall W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be STRICKEN AND DISMISSED either for failure to tender the court's $100 filing fee, see D.C. App. R. 3 (e); OR for FAILURE TO COMPLY with this court's previous orders. See DC App. R. 13. (BY: ETW)
03/17/2011TMC - (LODGED) PFR - OTSC - (LODGED) ROTSC
04/07/2011RECEIVED Petitioner's Response to OTSC.
05/12/2011 ORDERED that this PFR IS DISMISSED for failure to tender the $100 filing fee as petitioner has been barred by this court from proceeding IFP. It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is reminded of the requirements outlined in this court's previous order of July 7, 1994 in apeal 87-CV1284 which precluded petitioner from proceeding IFP and...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that THAT THIS COURT SHALL NOT ACCEPT (1) ANY FUTURE APPEAL/PFR filed by petitioner/appellant unless petitioner/appellant first provides proper proof of payment of the requisite filing fee for noting the appeal or (2) ...SEE HARDCOPY (FITEST)
05/12/2011DISMISSED
05/23/2011RECEIVED - PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (returned to Petitioner by mail IAW D.C.C.A. Order dated May 12, 2011)
05/27/2011RECEIVED from pro se Petitioner the returned Petition for Rehearing - no action required pursuant to DCCA Order dated 5/12/11 re: proof of payment