judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROCK (KAREEM) VS. STATE C/W 33518

Case Information: 33575
Short Caption:BROCK (KAREEM) VS. STATE C/W 33518Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33518 *, 33575Related Case(s): 69696 , 69696-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C136906Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/18/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00102
01/08/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33574, 33575, 33626, 33631, 33677, 33687, 33697, 33700. 99-01411
06/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-05289
06/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP
07/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we concude that the relief requested is not warranted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 33518, 33575. Document No. 00-12156.
08/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13816
08/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13816