judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ADAM DANTE CORPORATION, DBA ADAM AND EVE HEALTH SPA v. BEULAH H. SHARPE

Case: B-2859
B-2859
07/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ADAM DANTE CORPORATION, DBA ADAM AND EVE HEALTH SPA
BEULAH H. SHARPE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/05/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/05/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/30/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/26/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/15/1971Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/03/1972Notice sent to Court of Appeals
07/10/1972Response to Motion filed
07/07/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/05/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/05/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/30/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/21/1972Opinion issued
10/13/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/26/1971Response to Petition
07/15/1971Brief in Support of Petition
07/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/14/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cantey, Hanger, Gooch, Cravens and MunnAmicus Curiae
EMPLOYERS CASUALTY COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Beulah H. SharpeRespondent
Adam Dante Corporation, dba Adam and Eve Health SpaPetitioner
Louis S, MuldrowAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information