judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

J&K USA, INC. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Case Information: 75555
Short Caption:J&K USA, INC. VS. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A702573Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/17/2018 / Hauser, CharlesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/11/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
04/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 18-13924
04/11/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. 18-13929
04/13/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Sarah A. Morris
04/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. 18-14558
04/17/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Charles Hauser. 18-14716
05/07/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. 18-17166
05/07/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. 18-17269
05/08/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. 18-17451
05/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended. 18-18746
06/13/2018MotionFiled Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 18-22611
06/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Response to the Order to Show Cause due: July 16, 2018. 18-23184
07/16/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 18-26986
07/24/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 15 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 18-28189
08/08/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. 18-30405
10/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 5, 2018. 18-41221
11/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) 18-903002
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I. (SC) 18-903004
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II. (SC) 18-903003
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume III. (SC) 18-903005
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SC) 18-903006
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume V. (SC) 18-903007
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VI. (SC) 18-903010
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII. (SC) 18-903011
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VIII. (SC) 18-903012
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IX. (SC) 18-903013
11/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume X. (SC) 18-903014
11/28/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Time Extension for Bank of America's Answering Brief. (SC) 18-906130
11/28/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 7, 2019. (SC) 18-906137
01/07/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Second Time Extension for Bank of Amierca's Answering Brief. (SC). 19-00912
01/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 14, 2019. (SC) 19-01385
01/14/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) 19-01980
02/12/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 27, 2019. (SC). 19-06636
02/28/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) 19-09142
02/28/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/12/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn5 [The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participate in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] MG/LS/MD. (SC). 19-38135
10/07/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC) 19-41455
10/07/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
11/01/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 11, 2019. (SC) 19-41455