Case: 08-94-00198-CV
08-94-00198-CV
08/01/1994
Mandamus
Varner, James Ellis
Honorable Don Koons, Judge of the 255th District Court of Dallas County, Texas
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/09/2016 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
09/19/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/07/1995 | Shuck purged | | |
12/08/1994 | Fee paid | | |
11/17/1994 | Fee paid | | |
11/09/1994 | Fee paid | | |
11/07/1994 | Fee paid | | |
11/07/1994 | Fee paid | | |
10/20/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/20/1994 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/20/1994 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/23/1994 | Submitted | | |
09/23/1994 | Submission | | |
09/23/1994 | Submitted | | |
09/19/1994 | Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry | | |
09/12/1994 | Fee paid | | |
09/09/1994 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
09/09/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/09/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
09/09/1994 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
09/08/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
09/07/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/07/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
08/08/1994 | Fee paid | | |
08/02/1994 | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus | | |
08/02/1994 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
08/02/1994 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
08/02/1994 | Motion for leave to file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/02/1994 | Order entered | | |
08/02/1994 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
08/01/1994 | Fee paid | | |
08/01/1994 | Motion for leave to * filed | | |
08/01/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/09/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KOONS, DON | Respondent | Hon. Don Koons |
VARNER HOWE, PEGGY LEE | Respondent | Hon. James B. Martin |
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF SACHSE | Respondent | First Bank of Sachse |
VARNER, JAMES ELLIS | Relator | Hon. Paul Shunatona |
Trial Court Information
255th District Court
Dallas