judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY ALLEN JAMES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0158)
Case Number:S-11-0158Case Docketed On:06/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:GARY ALLEN JAMES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GARY ALLEN JAMES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Allen James Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 35
Citation:271 P.3d 1016

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/30/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk for copy of Second Amended Information. Judgment and Sentence does not contain the statutes that the Appellant was convicted under.EventPhone CallFinal
06/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/17/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/28/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/18/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the Court. Justice Voigt filed special concurrence in which Justice Golden joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/28/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal