judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MESSINEO VS. FIRST PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Case Information: 38383
Short Caption:MESSINEO VS. FIRST PRESBYTERIAN CHURCHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A433605Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2001 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
08/27/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Connie J. Elliano & Associates--check no. 0710.
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14434
09/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-17411
10/23/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge will review this matter within 60 days to determine whether further action has been taken by Appellants and a settlement conference can be held with all parties. 01-17857
10/29/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-18047
11/09/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
11/19/2001Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No.0720 returned to Connie J. Elliano & Associates. (No fee due for second notice of appeal in same case.)
11/19/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Notice of Second Appeal. 01-19375
11/29/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
12/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 30, 2002. 01-20969
01/07/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Connie J. Elliano. 02-00407
02/04/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 23, 2002. 02-02298
05/20/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 11, 2002. 02-08849
07/22/2002Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 02-12511
07/31/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-13116
07/31/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.