judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATIONAL COMMUNITY ACTION FOUNDATION V. FREDERICK N. SCHARF

Case Information: 11-AA-0246
Short Caption:NATIONAL COMMUNITY ACTION FOUNDATION V. FREDERICK N. SCHARFClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Lead:11-AA-0246Consolidated: 11-AA-1263
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00114-11Filed Date:03/03/2011

Opening Event Date:03/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/13/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerNational Community Action FoundationN
Andrew B. ClubokNN
Bryan M. StephanyNN
RespondentFrederick ScharfNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/03/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/03/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/03/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
03/18/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that National Community Action Foundation is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
04/01/2011RECEIVED- Amended copy of petiton for review and appearance
04/01/2011APPEARANCE- of Bryan M. Stephany and Andrew B. Clubok
06/10/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Petitioner) brief 5 days
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File to supplement the record or in the alternative to remand (Petitioner)
08/09/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion For Leave to File to supplement the record without prejudice to petitioner filing a motion to reopen the matter with the Office of Administrative Hearings.
08/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File brief to the extent that petitioner shall file a statement with this court as to the status of the motion to be filed in the Agency within 30 days from the date of this order.
08/30/2011FiledStatement re: status report to the court (Petitioner)
11/04/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals
11/04/2011FiledInitial Order - consolidating 11-AA-246 & 11-AA-1263, directing record
12/13/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
12/13/2011FiledRecord Completed
12/20/2011FiledBriefing Order
01/10/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (renewed) (Petitioner)Granted
01/24/2012LodgedReceived letter from respondent asking for an extension of time to file opposition. (sent back for copies and certicate of service) (Respondent)
01/27/2012FiledMotion For Summary Reversal or in the alternative motion to withdraw petitions for review (Petitioner)Granted
01/31/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OR TO WITHDRAW PFR//OPPO//REPLY//MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT REC
01/31/2012Filed(AMENDED) Motion For Summary Reversal or in the alternative motion to withdraw petitions for review (Petitioner)Granted
02/03/2012FiledOpposition to petitioner's motion for summary reversal. (Respondent)
02/09/2012FiledReply in support of petitoner's motion for summary reversal or in the alternative motion to withdraw petiton for review (Petitioner)
03/14/2012FiledORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTIONS TO SUPPLEMENT AND FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL ARE GRANTED TO THE EXTENT...AND THIS MATTER IS REMANDED and...
03/14/2012FiledRemanded
04/06/2012FiledMandate