judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROADHEAD VS. FARMERS INSURANCE

Case Information: 38384
Short Caption:BROADHEAD VS. FARMERS INSURANCECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A409089Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/06/2001 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Shook & Stone, Chtd.--check no. 4032.
08/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14437
08/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/10/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: September 4, 2001. 01-15232
09/14/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Missing original signature and not on form provided). Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.
09/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
09/21/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15956
09/25/2001Other Other. Mailed additional documents to Settlement Judge M. Nelson Segal.
11/05/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-18447
11/05/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-18448
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, ' . . . this appeal is dismissed.' The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 01-19434
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.