judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEWA JACKSON V. LOUIS FRANKLIN BROWN, II

Case Information: 11-FM-0287
Short Caption:KEWA JACKSON V. LOUIS FRANKLIN BROWN, IIClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB1687-10Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/09/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKewa Jackson N
Arthur Luk NN
Kavita Kumar Puri NN
Matthew EisensteinNN
AppelleeLouis Franklin Brown, IINPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 4, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
03/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 2/3/11 2/4/11 11/5/10 (rt. needed)
03/25/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (118-pgs/tape 11/5/10 proc)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (122-pgs/tape 11/5/10 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (45-pgs/tape 2/3/11 proc.)
04/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (39-pgs/tape 2/4/11 proc.)w/cd
04/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
05/13/2011APPEARANCE -of Arthur Luk on behalf of aplt
05/13/2011APPEARANCE- of Kavita Kumar Puri on behalf of aplt
05/13/2011APPEARANCE- of Matthew Eisenstein on behalf of aplt
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
05/27/2011RECEIVED - aplt supp to motion for stay.
06/13/2011 On consideration fo appellant's motion to stay appeal pending resolution of a Super. Civ. Ct. R. 60(b) motion in the Superior Court, it is ORDERED that the motion to stay is hereby held in abeyance. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 60 days from the date of this order as to the status of the motion in the trial courts. (ETW)
08/10/2011FiledStatement regarding Status of Trial Court Proceedings (Appellant)
08/26/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte - directing status statement
10/20/2011FiledStatus Report regarding pending (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledOrder directing renewed statement
01/04/2012FiledStatement regarding status of trial court proceeding "AND" motion to withdraw the appeal (Appellant)
02/09/2012FiledOrder Granting motion to withdraw the appeal (Appellant)
02/09/2012FiledDismissed
02/09/2012FiledMandate