judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COREY AND KATHRYN DAVISON; RONALD AND STACEY RICHNER; AND MARTON RANCH, INC. v. WYOMING GAME AND FISH COMMISSION and the WYOMING GAME AND FISH DEPARTMENT

Case Heading (S-10-0007)
Case Number:S-10-0007Case Docketed On:01/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:COREY AND KATHRYN DAVISON; RONALD AND STACEY RICHNER; AND MARTON RANCH, INC. v. WYOMING GAME AND FISH COMMISSION and the WYOMING GAME AND FISH DEPARTMENT
Full Title:COREY AND KATHRYN DAVISON; RONALD AND STACEY RICHNER; AND MARTON RANCH, INC., Appellants (Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants), v. WYOMING GAME AND FISH COMMISSION and the WYOMING GAME AND FISH DEPARTMENT, Appellees (Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCorey DavisonHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantKathryn DavisonHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRonald RichnerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantStacey RichnerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMarton Ranch, Inc.Harriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppelleeWyoming Game and Fish CommissionBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
James Kaste
AppelleeDepartment of Game and FishBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
James Kaste

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property -Servitudes, Water Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 121
Citation:238 P.3d 556

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/08/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/25/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Harriet M. Hageman for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Kaste for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/07/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Harriet M. Hageman and Kara Brighton, argument by Ms. Hageman for appellants; James Kaste, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/10/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/10/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/14/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/13/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal