judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SISSON VS. THOMPSON

Case Information: 33589
Short Caption:SISSON VS. THOMPSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A363356Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Senior Justice YoungPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Turner, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/01/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 101707.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00140
01/11/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
01/11/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Orders filed 10/27/98 and 12/7/98. Due Date: 10 days
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/25/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 10/27/98. 99-00483
01/25/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copies of two orders filed in district court on 12/7/98. 99-00484
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00512
01/28/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
10/04/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09491
11/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 99-10911
11/16/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Mailed on 11/15/99--FedEx. 99-11350
12/06/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: September 1, 3, 4, 9, 10, 1998; September 1, 4, 9, 10, 1999. To Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook/Joy Hinck. 99-12198
12/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Denying Motion to Dismiss and Reinstating Briefing. Respondent's motion to dismiss is hereby denied. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Court reporters Mary Beth Cook and Joy Hinck shall have 30 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(b); Appellant: 100 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
02/02/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 1, 1998. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 00-01690
02/14/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. (copy) from court reporter Joy Hinck to Clark County Court Administrator Charles Short re: status of transcripts. The transcripts are being held until payment is made. 00-03790
03/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Extend Briefing and for Order Directing Transcription of Trial. 00-04368
03/20/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter from court reporter Joy Hinck to attorney Kirby Smith re: transcripts. 00-04370
03/29/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition of Real Party in Interest Joy Hinck to Motion to Extend Briefing and for Order Directing Transcription of Trial. 00-05051
04/03/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 4, 1998; September 9, 1998. Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 00-05344
04/04/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 5, 2000. 00-05408
04/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. We grant appellant's March 20, 2000, motion in part, and deny, as moot, in part. Court reporter Hinck shall have 20 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(b). fn1[On April 3, 2000 court reporter Hinck filed certified copies of transcripts of proceedings held on September 4 and 9, 1998. To date the court has not received the requested transcripts for the proceedings conducted on September 10, 1998.] Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-06087
04/26/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Joy Hinck. There were no proceedings held in this matter on September 10, 2000. 00-06775
05/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We vacate that portion of our April 17, 2000, order requiring court reporter Hinck to file a certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings on September 10, 2000. 00-08820
06/19/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/16/00. 00-10429
06/19/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-10430
06/23/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: September 8, 1998. To Court Reporters: Mary Beth Cook/Joy Hinck. 00-10793
07/14/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 7, 2000. 00-12180
08/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-13661
08/09/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Respondent shall have to and including August 14, 2000, to file and serve the answering brief. 00-13801
08/16/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Brief for Good Cause and to Supplement the Record with Transcript of Expert Witness Testimony Necessary for Determination of Appeal. 00-14318
08/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Brief for Good Cause and to Supplement the Record with Transcript of Expert Witness Testimony Necessary for Determination of Appeal. 00-14380
08/21/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Brief for Good Cause and to Supplement the Record with Transcript of Expert Witness Testimony Necessary for Determination of Appeal. 00-14613
09/06/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Brief for Good Cause and to Supplement the Record with Transcript of Expert Witness Testimony Necessary for Determination of Appeal. 00-15669
09/15/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. 00-16342
09/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 23, 2000, appellant filed a 'request for transcript of proceedings.' In the supplemental transcript request appellant requested that court reporters 'Mary Beth Cook/Joy Hinck' prepare and file a transcript of the proceedings held on September 8, 1998.fn1[Although the supplemental transcript form actually requests transcripts for proceedings on 'September 8, 1999,' it appears that appellant meant to request a transcript held on September 8, 1998. If this is not correct, appellant shall notify this court in writing within 10 days of this order.] Attached to the supplemental transcript request form was a November 12, 1999, order of the district court allowing appellant to proceed in forma pauperis in this appeal. Court reporters Cook and Hinck shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file and serve the requested transcript or notify this court in writing if there is some reason the requested transcript cannot be filed. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed according to the provisions of NRAP 31(a)(1).On August 16, 2000, respondent filed a motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief and to supplement the record with the transcript requested in appellant's supplemental transcript request form. On August 21, 2000, appellant filed a response to respondent's motion. Thereafter, on September 15, 2000, the parties filed a stipulation to extend the time to file the answering brief. In light of our directions concerning the briefing schedule in this appeal and the supplemental transcript request form in this order, we deny respondent's motion and disapprove the parties' stipulation as moot. 00-16371
09/29/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 8, 1998. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 00-17257
10/20/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/18/00. 00-18648
10/20/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-18649
11/21/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 11/20/00. 00-20423
05/01/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-07312
05/01/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP01A-WM/ML/NB.
08/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "we ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-WM/ML/NB 01-13537
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13573
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 18, 2001. 01-13573