judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD ALLEN TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0006)
Case Number:S-10-0006Case Docketed On:01/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RICHARD ALLEN TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD ALLEN TUCKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Allen TuckerDiane Elizabeth Courselle
Kevin Ward
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 162
Citation:245 P.3d 301

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/13/2010Correspondence - Incoming from AppellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/15/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Michael H. Reese for AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/20/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Public Defender granted leave to withdrawOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/19/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/06/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/07/2010Correspondence - Incoming - Copy of letter from Appellant to Counsel. No action necessary.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Second Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for 3rd Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/20/2010Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further requests will be consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
05/14/2010Correspondence - Incoming - Copy of letter from Appellant to counselCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/27/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Desigantion of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution (entry of appearance of Diane Courselle).Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
07/23/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief (reply)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance and Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/26/2010Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time with original signatureEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/02/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Michael H. Reese allowed to withdrawOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/06/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Kevin Ward to appear on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
08/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Leda Pojman to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/11/2010Event - Phone Call to Defender Aid, received copies of Consent and Approval, requested OriginalEventPhone CallFinal
08/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received Consent of Client for Kevin Ward to appear on behalf of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, Defender Aid Program and Kevin Ward, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Ward for appellant; Leda J. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/10/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/28/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/28/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/29/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal