judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KRITINI DAVENPORT V. 1613 HARVARD, LP

Case Information: 11-CV-0286
Short Caption:KRITINI DAVENPORT V. 1613 HARVARD, LPClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Lead: 11-CV-0169 Consolidated:11-CV-0286
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB33056-10Filed Date:02/25/2011

Opening Event Date:02/25/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKritini Davenport YPro SeN
Appellee1613 Harvard Limited PartnershipN
Joshua M. GreenbergNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/15/2011ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION It is *****MORE***** (IN 11CV169)
03/15/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPEAL NOS 11CV169 & 11cv286 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. (RDKRTH) (kt)
03/21/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Krittini Davenport
03/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 - (24 pgs/Tape - 1/10/11 proc.)
03/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (105 pgs/Tape - 2/9/11 proc.)
03/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (6 pgs/Tape - 2/23/11 proc.)w/CD attached
03/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/25/2011RECORD INDEX both
03/25/2011RECORD COPIES both
03/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 30, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days, and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
06/13/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 11, 2011, directing appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that these appeals are dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
06/13/2011DISMISSED
07/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED