judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VINCENT MILLS, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 09-CF-1232
Short Caption:VINCENT MILLS, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-9444-08Filed Date:10/08/2009

Opening Event Date:10/08/2009Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/18/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/13/2010
Argued/Submitted:02/24/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/17/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVincent Mills, Jr.Y
Kevin McCantsYY
Appellee 165 N
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2009NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/22/2009 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (GP)
12/02/2009 On consideration of this court's order of October 22, 2009, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (GP)
12/24/2009ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
12/24/2009DISMISSED
12/30/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
01/22/2010ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate appeal is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. F/O that Kevin McCants, Esquire, is hereby assigned as pro-bono counsel representing appellant in this appeal. F/O that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (ETW)
02/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (196 pgs/Johnson) 6/8/09 proc.
02/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (197-457 pgs/Johnson) 6/9/09 proc.
02/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (458-644 pgs/Johnson) 6/10/09 proc.
02/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (645-897 pgs/Johnson) 6/11/09 proc.
02/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (176 pgs/Kaczorowki) 6/15-17/09 proc.
02/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (13 pgs/Price) 6/18/09 proc. w/cd
02/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (Superior Court Pleading filing)(SEALED - 1 brown envelope)
02/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (Superior Court filing)(SEALED - 1 brown envelope)
02/18/2010RECORD COPIES
02/18/2010RECORD INDEX
02/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/18/2010RECORD COMPLETED
03/08/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP)
04/28/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP)
05/11/2010 ORDERED, ss, that this court's order of April 28, 2010, is hereby vacated. It is F/O that counsel for appellant shall w/in 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time w/in which to do so. (ETW)
06/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
06/08/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief (no appendix)
06/23/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before June 7, 2010, and has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either tot imely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC)
06/23/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF/no appendix
07/30/2010 On consideration of this court's order of June 23, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to submit the limited appendix w/in 15 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the document has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall w/in 10 calendar days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the fialure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (ISR)
08/10/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
08/10/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx
08/26/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
08/26/2010LIMITED APPENDIX - Appellant
09/23/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until October 26, 2010
10/06/2010RECEIVED - aple's brief.
10/13/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief of appellee, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellee is filed. It is F/O that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (Castillo)
10/13/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/13/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/08/2010error(pls reuse)
11/24/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
12/16/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
02/24/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/24/2011SUBMITTED (Ruiz, Kramer, Pryor)
03/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
04/17/2012FiledMandate