judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RANDALL SINCLAIR and CARMEN SINCLAIR v. THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, and STETSON ENGINEERING, INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0164)
Case Number:S-11-0164Case Docketed On:07/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:RANDALL SINCLAIR and CARMEN SINCLAIR v. THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, and STETSON ENGINEERING, INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:RANDALL SINCLAIR and CARMEN SINCLAIR, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, and STETSON ENGINEERING, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRandall SinclairRandall T. Cox
AppellantCarmen SinclairRandall T. Cox
AppelleeThe City of GilletteCatherine M. Fox
AppelleeStetson Engineering, Inc., a Wyoming corporationKendal Royce Hoopes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2012 WY 19
Citation:270 P.3d 644

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/29/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant. (Held for original signature page).EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/17/2011Brief - Appellee - City of Gillette.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee City of Gillette.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/17/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellee Stetson Engineering, Inc.BriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
10/18/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellee Stetson Engineering, Inc., indicating that they do not intend to participate in this appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
10/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/31/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kate Fox for appellee City of Gillette.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Randall T. Cox for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Randall T. Cox for appellants; Catherine M. Fox for appellee City of Gillette) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/28/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal