judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM P. BLOUNT V. OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Case Information: 11-AA-0278
Short Caption:WILLIAM P. BLOUNT V. OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02751-10Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerWilliam P. Blount NPro SeN
RespondentOmni Hotels Management CorporationNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY) (Filed in OAH on 1/12/11).
03/10/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/21/2011 On consideration of the petition for review filed with this court on March 10, 2011, from an order entered by the Office of Adminstrative Hearings on January 12, 2011, and it appearing that petitioner has failed to attach a copy of the order being appealed with the petition for review, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall submit a copy of the order on appeal within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
04/22/2011 On consideration fo this court's order of March 21, 2011, directing petitioner to submit a copy of the order on appeal within 10 calendar days, and it appearing that petitioner has faield to comply with the order, and petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, it is ORDERED that the petition is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). It is F/O that petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. (ETW)
04/22/2011DISMISSED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED
08/02/2011FiledReceived - 4/22/11 order returned from post office. remailed on 6/22/11. returned from post office. sent to file room. (Petitioner)