judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WORLD FAMILY CORPORATION, A Wyoming Corporation, dba MORROW GLOBAL v. WINDJAMMER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Domesticated in Wyoming and UINTA COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, STATE OF WYOMING, Evanston, Wyoming; and WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0165)
Case Number:S-11-0165Case Docketed On:07/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WORLD FAMILY CORPORATION, A Wyoming Corporation, dba MORROW GLOBAL v. WINDJAMMER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Domesticated in Wyoming and UINTA COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, STATE OF WYOMING, Evanston, Wyoming; and WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WORLD FAMILY CORPORATION, A Wyoming Corporation, dba MORROW GLOBAL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WINDJAMMER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Domesticated in Wyoming, and UINTA COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, STATE OF WYOMING, Evanston, Wyoming; and WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWorld Family Corporation, a Wyoming corporation, dba Morrow GlobalTara Brooke Nethercott
AppelleeUinta County School District No. 1Mark W Harris
AppelleeWindjammer Communications, LLC, a Delaware limited liability companyMark W Harris
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Property
Opinion Number:2012 WY 48
Citation:273 P.3d 1078 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (Amended caption, added Department of Transportation, although not included in order appealed.)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
08/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2011Brief - Appellee Uinta County School District No. 1.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/18/2011Brief - Appellee - State of Wyoming DOT.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by Appellee Windjammer CommunicationsNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Uinta County School District No. 1, State of Wyoming and Windjammer Communications, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/14/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting -Mark W. Harris for appellee Windjammer Communications; and Douglas Moench for appellee Wyoming DOT.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tara Nethercott for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tara Brooke Nethercott for appellant; Douglas J. Moench, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Mark W. Harris for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/28/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/17/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/16/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal