Case: 08-98-00285-CR
08-98-00285-CR
08/26/1998
Other Felony
Molina, Christopher Paul
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/29/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/29/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/26/2000 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
09/26/2000 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Refused | |
04/20/2000 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
04/10/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |
03/16/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/16/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/06/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/06/2000 | Submission | | |
01/06/2000 | Submitted | | |
12/07/1999 | Submission | | |
11/22/1999 | Order entered | | |
11/02/1999 | Submission | | |
10/18/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
10/18/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/18/1999 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/18/1999 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/18/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/11/1999 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
09/09/1999 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/09/1999 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/09/1999 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/09/1999 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/14/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
06/09/1999 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/09/1999 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/23/1999 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/23/1999 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
04/01/1999 | Reporter/Recorder's Record filed | | |
03/17/1999 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/15/1999 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |
02/10/1999 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/28/1999 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |
12/10/1998 | Affidavit from Reporter Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/10/1998 | Affidavit from Reporter Filed | | |
10/13/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/02/1998 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
09/04/1998 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
08/26/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/26/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/29/2000 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MOLINA, CHRISTOPHER PAUL | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. David P. Zavoda |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Randall W. Reynolds |
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Ward
Honorable Bob Parks
98-01-4030-CRW
5 yrs.