judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES L. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-SP-0289
Short Caption:JAMES L. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Denial - Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC107-11Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames L. Brown YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 4, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
03/18/2011RECORD INDEX
03/18/2011RECORD COPIES
03/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
04/01/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed iwthin 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL without prejudice.
04/22/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b) (By: ETW)
04/22/2011DISMISSED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED