judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KARI JO ROEMMICH v. SHANE CHRISTOPHER ROEMMICH

Case Heading (S-10-0008)
Case Number:S-10-0008Case Docketed On:01/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:KARI JO ROEMMICH v. SHANE CHRISTOPHER ROEMMICH
Full Title:KARI JO ROEMMICH, Appellant (Defendant), v. SHANE CHRISTOPHER ROEMMICH, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKari Jo. RoemmichStacy E. Casper
AppelleeShane Christopher RoemmichNick Edward Beduhn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation, Child Support
Opinion Number:2010 WY 115
Citation:238 P.3d 89 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/08/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
02/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/30/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/04/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/06/2010Brief - Other - Signature pages of Appellant's Reply Brief requested by CourtBriefOtherFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Incoming - No designation of record filed by Appellant, improper designation filed by AppelleeNotice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
05/07/2010Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Amended) - appellee.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/17/2010Event - Other. Received designation of record from counsel for appellant; however, it was captioned in the Wyoming Supreme Court and not filed in district court. Contacted office and advised secretary to file in district court and send a copy. Kept copy.EventOtherFinal
05/17/2010Fees - Sanctions received - designation - counsel for appellant.FeesSanctions received - designationFinal
05/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/20/2010Fees - Sanctions received - designation from counsel for AppelleeFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/20/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/25/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/10/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanding for further proceedings. Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/30/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/27/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal