judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HORTON VS. TONE

Case Information: 33591
Short Caption:HORTON VS. TONECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - CV9800592AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Hicks, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David Horton--check no. 1953.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00142
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00645
04/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and to Impose Sanctions. 99-03069
04/27/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to "Motion to Dismiss and to Impose Sanctions". 99-03319
05/04/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and to Impose Sanctions.
07/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-05826
07/02/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-05827
07/26/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed." fn1[We deny as moot respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and to Impose Sanctions, filed April 20, 1999, and the opposition to Motion to Dismiss and to Impose Sanctions, filed April 27, 1999]. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 99-06706
07/26/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.