judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNNY A. WRIGHT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0010)
Case Number:S-10-0010Case Docketed On:01/11/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JOHNNY A. WRIGHT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHNNY A. WRIGHT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohnny A. Wright Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
D. Michael Pauling
Terry L. Armitage

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2010 WY 94
Citation:234 P.3d 1228

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/11/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
02/26/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/30/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/31/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/01/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/15/2010Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
04/15/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/15/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
04/15/2010Record - Received unfiled record from Public DefenderRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
04/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro-se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/16/2010Service - Amended Certificate of ServiceServiceAmended Certificate of ServiceFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Certificate of ServiceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2010Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
06/17/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellant (Appellant's brief was due 06/14/2010 per Order)BriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
06/30/2010Opinion - Published order Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/16/2010Record - Returned unfiled record to the Clerk of District CourtRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
07/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/19/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal