judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GANG PLANK MARINA, ET AL V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0290
Short Caption:GANG PLANK MARINA, ET AL V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB153-10Filed Date:03/09/2011

Opening Event Date:03/09/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGang Plank N
W. John Vernon NN
PetitionerGuarantee Fund ManagementN
W. John Vernon NN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/09/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/09/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/10/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
04/26/2011STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL (filed by Petitioners & Claimant Ronald Harden)dwm
05/20/2011DISMISSED this petition for review is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13(b)(2). (ETW)
05/20/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
08/04/2011FiledMandate