judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUGH and LEE HAGEMAN, as parents and next friends of C and LH; DEWEY and DINELLE HAGEMAN, as parents and next friends of T, M and WH; ROBERT and JOHANNA ABERNATHY, as parents and next friends of TA; CHAD and SANDY ARNETT, as parents and next friends of K, T and TA; GREG and JOLENE BEBO, as parents and next friends of N, J and MB; MARK and ROSE BEBO, as grandparents and next friends of N, J and MB; TODD and ANNE BERRY, as parents and next friends of L and CB; RICHARD and LUCINDA BREEDLOVE, as parents and next friends of RWB; JERRY and KIM BREMER, as parents and next friends of CB; ERIC and SHELLY DUNCAN, as parents and next friends of J and ID; DAN ELLIS, as the parent and next friend of ZE; CORY and DAWN GILCHRIEST, as parents and next friends of C and SG; EDDIE and TAMI GREENWALD, as parents and next friends of K and MG; SHAWN and MARLISA HALL, as parents and next friends of H and JH; J.L. and SHERRI HERBST, as parents and next friends of BH; BYRON and DONNA JUMA, as parents and next friends of B, S, C and TJ; SHANE and CHERIE LIMMER, as parents and next friends of C and ML; JEFF and KARI McCLUN, as parents and next friends of K, K and KM; MARLA McNEES, as parent and next friend of PM; BRETT A. MEYER, as parent and next friend of G, K, and TM; PAUL and CHRISTINE MILLER, as parents and next friend of P, S and PM; JEFF MUELLER, as parent and next friend of C and TM; LOIS A. PAULES, as grandmother of J and DG; ALVIN and RENNAE RUIZ, as parents and next friends of LR; TIM and MICHELE TOEDTER; ROCKY and PAULA VAUGHN, as parents and next friends of C and MV; TERRY and MARY VIKTORIN; SHANE VIKTORIN; DAVID and SUSAN WALKER; as parents and best friends of T and EW; RUSSELL and JoANNE WALTER, as parents and next friends of KW; MICHAEL and GRETCHEN WOLLERT, as parents and next friends of C, T G, and GW v. THE GOSHEN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1; RAY SCHULTE, in his official capacity as Superintendent of Goshen County School District No. 1; LINDA KESSLER, LINDA JOHNSON, CLARK HOUSE, BRENT KAUFMAN, JIM EDDINGTON, ED JOLOVICH, CHARLIE HARSHBERGER, and ROB BRANHAM, in their official capacities as members of the Board of Trustees of the Goshen County School District No. 1

Case Heading (S-10-0009)
Case Number:S-10-0009Case Docketed On:01/11/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wyoming State Constitution
Short Title:HUGH and LEE HAGEMAN, as parents and next friends of C and LH; DEWEY and DINELLE HAGEMAN, as parents and next friends of T, M and WH; ROBERT and JOHANNA ABERNATHY, as parents and next friends of TA; CHAD and SANDY ARNETT, as parents and next friends of K, T and TA; GREG and JOLENE BEBO, as parents and next friends of N, J and MB; MARK and ROSE BEBO, as grandparents and next friends of N, J and MB; TODD and ANNE BERRY, as parents and next friends of L and CB; RICHARD and LUCINDA BREEDLOVE, as parents and next friends of RWB; JERRY and KIM BREMER, as parents and next friends of CB; ERIC and SHELLY DUNCAN, as parents and next friends of J and ID; DAN ELLIS, as the parent and next friend of ZE; CORY and DAWN GILCHRIEST, as parents and next friends of C and SG; EDDIE and TAMI GREENWALD, as parents and next friends of K and MG; SHAWN and MARLISA HALL, as parents and next friends of H and JH; J.L. and SHERRI HERBST, as parents and next friends of BH; BYRON and DONNA JUMA, as parents and next friends of B, S, C and TJ; SHANE and CHERIE LIMMER, as parents and next friends of C and ML; JEFF and KARI McCLUN, as parents and next friends of K, K and KM; MARLA McNEES, as parent and next friend of PM; BRETT A. MEYER, as parent and next friend of G, K, and TM; PAUL and CHRISTINE MILLER, as parents and next friend of P, S and PM; JEFF MUELLER, as parent and next friend of C and TM; LOIS A. PAULES, as grandmother of J and DG; ALVIN and RENNAE RUIZ, as parents and next friends of LR; TIM and MICHELE TOEDTER; ROCKY and PAULA VAUGHN, as parents and next friends of C and MV; TERRY and MARY VIKTORIN; SHANE VIKTORIN; DAVID and SUSAN WALKER; as parents and best friends of T and EW; RUSSELL and JoANNE WALTER, as parents and next friends of KW; MICHAEL and GRETCHEN WOLLERT, as parents and next friends of C, T G, and GW v. THE GOSHEN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1; RAY SCHULTE, in his official capacity as Superintendent of Goshen County School District No. 1; LINDA KESSLER, LINDA JOHNSON, CLARK HOUSE, BRENT KAUFMAN, JIM EDDINGTON, ED JOLOVICH, CHARLIE HARSHBERGER, and ROB BRANHAM, in their official capacities as members of the Board of Trustees of the Goshen County School District No. 1
Full Title:HUGH and LEE HAGEMAN, as parents and next friends of C and LH; DEWEY and DINELLE HAGEMAN, as parents and next friends of T, M and WH; ROBERT and JOHANNA ABERNATHY, as parents and next friends of TA; CHAD and SANDY ARNETT, as parents and next friends of K, T and TA; GREG and JOLENE BEBO, as parents and next friends of N, J and MB; MARK and ROSE BEBO, as grandparents and next friends of N, J and MB; TODD and ANNE BERRY, as parents and next friends of L and CB; RICHARD and LUCINDA BREEDLOVE, as parents and next friends of RWB; JERRY and KIM BREMER, as parents and next friends of CB; ERIC and SHELLY DUNCAN, as parents and next friends of J and ID; DAN ELLIS, as the parent and next friend of ZE; CORY and DAWN GILCHRIEST, as parents and next friends of C and SG; EDDIE and TAMI GREENWALD, as parents and next friends of K and MG; SHAWN and MARLISA HALL, as parents and next friends of H and JH; J.L. and SHERRI HERBST, as parents and next friends of BH; BYRON and DONNA JUMA, as parents and next friends of B, S, C and TJ; SHANE and CHERIE LIMMER, as parents and next friends of C and ML; JEFF and KARI McCLUN, as parents and next friends of K, K and KM; MARLA McNEES, as parent and next friend of PM; BRETT A. MEYER, as parent and next friend of G, K, and TM; PAUL and CHRISTINE MILLER, as parents and next friend of P, S and PM; JEFF MUELLER, as parent and next friend of C and TM; LOIS A. PAULES, as grandmother of J and DG; ALVIN and RENNAE RUIZ, as parents and next friends of LR; TIM and MICHELE TOEDTER; ROCKY and PAULA VAUGHN, as parents and next friends of C and MV; TERRY and MARY VIKTORIN; SHANE VIKTORIN; DAVID and SUSAN WALKER; as parents and best friends of T and EW; RUSSELL and JoANNE WALTER, as parents and next friends of KW; MICHAEL and GRETCHEN WOLLERT, as parents and next friends of C, T G, and GW, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. THE GOSHEN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1; RAY SCHULTE, in his official capacity as Superintendent of Goshen County School District No. 1; LINDA KESSLER, LINDA JOHNSON, CLARK HOUSE, BRENT KAUFMAN, JIM EDDINGTON, ED JOLOVICH, CHARLIE HARSHBERGER, and ROB BRANHAM, in their official capacities as members of the Board of Trustees of the Goshen County School District No. 1, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHugh HagemanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantLee HagemanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDewey HagemanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDinelle HagemanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRobert AbernathyHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJohanna AbernathyHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantChad ArnettHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantSandy ArnettHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantGreg BeboHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJolene BeboHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMark BeboHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRose BeboHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantTodd BerryHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantAnne BerryHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRichard BreedloveHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantLucinda BreedloveHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJerry BremerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantKim BremerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantEric DuncanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantShelly DuncanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDan EllisHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantCory GilchriestHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDawn GilchriestHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantEddie GreenwaldHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantTami GreenwaldHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantShawn HallHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMarlisa HallHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJ.L. HerbstHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantSherri HerbstHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantByron JumaHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDonna JumaHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantShane LimmerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantCherie LimmerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJeff McClunHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantKari McClunHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMarla McNeesHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantBrett A. MeyerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantPaul MillerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantChristine MillerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJeff MuellerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantLois A. PaulesHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantAlvin RuizHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRennae RuizHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantTim ToedterHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMichele ToedterHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRocky VaughnHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantPaula VaughnHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantTerry ViktorinHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMary ViktorinHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantShane ViktorinHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDavid WalkerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantSusan WalkerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRussell WalterHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJoAnne WalterHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMichael WollertHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantGretchen WollertHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppelleeGoshen County School District No. 1Tracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeRay SchulteTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeLinda KesslerTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeLinda JohnsonTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeClark HouseTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeBrent KaufmanTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeJames A. EddingtonTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeEd JolovichTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeCharlie HarshbergerTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeRob BranhamTracy J. Copenhaver

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Constitutional Law - Wyoming
Opinion Number:2011 WY 91
Citation:256 P.3d 487

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/11/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2010Brief - Appellant (Document accepted as timely filed since counsel had difficulty with system, but began process of filing before 5:00 p.m.)BriefAppellantFinal
03/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/03/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Harriet Hageman for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tracy J. Copenhaver for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Harriet M. Hageman for appellants; Tracy J. Copenhaver for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/06/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/22/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/23/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal