Register of Actions
Case No. 10M27503X
State of Nevada vs Radimak, Nathaniel Walter | § § § § § |
|
Lead Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Radimak, Nathaniel Walter | |||
State of Nevada | State of Nevada | |||
Charges: Radimak, Nathaniel Walter | Statute | Level | Date | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | CHALLENGE TO FIGHT-DISORDERLY CONDUCT | 12.33.010B | Misdemeanor | 09/05/2010 | |
OTHER EVENTS AND HEARINGS | |||
---|---|---|---|
09/05/2010 | Own Recognizance Release Form | ||
09/05/2010 | Temporary Custody Record | ||
09/29/2010 | COMPLETED BY JI MinuteCode1: COMPLETED BY JI MinuteCode3: COMPLETED BY JI | ||
11/02/2010 | TRANSFERRED TO JC TRANSFERRED TO JC | ||
11/02/2010 | COMPLETED BY LLO MinuteCode1: COMPLETED BY LLO MinuteCode3: COMPLETED BY LLO | ||
11/02/2010 | CTRACK Track Assignment JC10 | ||
11/03/2010 | RECEIVED FROM DA RECEIVED FROM DA | ||
11/03/2010 | COMPLAINT FILED COMPLAINT FILED | ||
11/03/2010 | Minute Order | ||
11/03/2010 | Criminal Complaint (NON USJR) | ||
11/05/2010 | BENCH WARRANT ISSUED (Judicial Officer: Tobiasson, Melanie A. ) MISD ARRGN | ||
11/05/2010 | Arraignment (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Tobiasson, Melanie A.) | ||
11/05/2010 | Bench Warrant - Face Sheet | ||
11/05/2010 | Bench Warrant Confidential | ||
01/01/2013 | Administrative Reassignment to Department 6 Case reassigned from Department 10 (Judge Melanie A. Tobiasson) | ||
01/01/2015 | Administrative Reassignment to Department 4 Case reassigned from Department 06 (Judge William Kephart) | ||
12/31/2016 | Administrative Reassignment to Department 2 Case reassigned from Department 04 (Judge Melissa Saragosa) |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10M27503X | Radimak, Nathaniel Walter | 11/02/2010 JC Department 2 | Misdemeanor Active |
|