judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: KURT D. MITCHELL

Case Information: 11-BG-0294
Short Caption:IN RE: KURT D. MITCHELLClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN417-10Filed Date:03/09/2011

Opening Event Date:03/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
William R. RossNY
Wallace E. Shipp NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentKurt D. Mitchell NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/09/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of disciplinary order of the Supreme Court of Florida suspending respondent for ten days.
03/09/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a copy of a letter addressed to respondent advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation to the court that he be suspended pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (d), and of his obligation to file an affidavit pursuant to Sec 14 (g) of Rule XI.
04/01/2011ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of Florida suspending reespondent from the practice of law for 10 days, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Colulmbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended for ten days from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
05/17/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline
05/19/2011TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of bar counsel - proposed order
05/26/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court of a second address for respondent: 9407 71st Avenue E, Palmetto, FL 34221
06/01/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court of respondent's correct address: 9407 71st Avenue E, Palmetto, FL 34221
06/23/2011SUSPENSION ORDERED that Kurt D. Mitchell, Esquire, is hereby suspended for a period of ten days. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirement of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (BR,NE,KG)
06/23/2011FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Kurt D. Mitchell, Esquire, is hereby suspended for a period of ten days. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirement of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (BR,NE,KG)
07/07/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit in compliant with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.
08/10/2011FiledAffidavit of respondent (Respondent)