judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: MICHAEL BEALL #2 v. SKY BLUE ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Heading (S-11-0162)
Case Number:S-11-0162Case Docketed On:07/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: MICHAEL BEALL #2 v. SKY BLUE ENTERPRISES, INC.
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WYOMING WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: MICHAEL BEALL #2, Appellant (Employee/Claimant), v. SKY BLUE ENTERPRISES, INC., Appellee (Employer/Objector).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael BeallDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeBlue Sky Enterprises, Inc.Bradley Trent Cave
Isaac Nathan Sutphin
Maryt Louise Fredrickson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 38
Citation:271 P.3d 1022

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/29/2011Brief - Appellant; and received designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
08/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Michael Beall; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Sky Blue Enterprises, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/01/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/02/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Michael BeallEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/10/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/28/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/28/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for attorney's fees and costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/29/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Sky Blue Enterprises' motion for attorney's fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/24/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs - Counsel for claimantOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/24/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs - Appellee Sky Blue EnterprisesOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/24/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/24/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/26/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal