judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAIG E. ADELIZZI and BETSY ADELIZZI, husband and wife v. ROGER FRED STRATTON, d/b/a STRATTON REAL ESTATE; MARY MCGILL, individually and as an agent for STRATTON REAL ESTATE

Case Heading (S-09-0257)
Case Number:S-09-0257Case Docketed On:12/14/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Property
Short Title:CRAIG E. ADELIZZI and BETSY ADELIZZI, husband and wife v. ROGER FRED STRATTON, d/b/a STRATTON REAL ESTATE; MARY MCGILL, individually and as an agent for STRATTON REAL ESTATE
Full Title:CRAIG E. ADELIZZI and BETSY ADELIZZI, husband and wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ROGER FRED STRATTON, d/b/a STRATTON REAL ESTATE; MARY MCGILL, individually and as an agent for STRATTON REAL ESTATE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCraig E. AdelizziJames R. Bell
AppellantBetsy AdelizziJames R. Bell
AppelleeRoger Fred StrattonPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeMary McGillPatrick J. Murphy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Limitation of Actions, Professional negligence, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2010 WY 148
Citation:243 P.3d 563

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/14/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/14/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/22/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/09/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James R. Bell for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for appellee Stratton.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/11/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (James R. Bell for appellants; Patrick J. Murphy for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/17/2010Correspondence - IncomingCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Letter from counsel for AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/6/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal