judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES B. SQUIRES V. H STREET SELF-STORAGE, LLC, ETAL

Case Information: 11-CV-0275
Short Caption:CHARLES B. SQUIRES V. H STREET SELF-STORAGE, LLC, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 11-CV-0274 Consolidated:11-CV-0275
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1406-09Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles B. Squires YPro SeN
AppelleeH Street Self Storage LLCN
Eric D. MitchellNN
AppelleeColumbia Storage Management LLCN
Eric D. MitchellNN
AppelleeDarryl Roberts N
Eric D. MitchellNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/22/2011 Upon consideration of the notices of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for these appeals, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-274 and 11-CV-275 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
03/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a motion with the Court Reporting Division for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s) for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit your motion to the appropriate judge for decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of the document with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to an order of this court, including this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (JAC) elp
03/31/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transript (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED FOR 10/25 and 10/26/10) (elp)
05/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (262-pgs/bur 10/25-26/10 proc.)w/cd
05/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv274
05/25/2011RECORD COPIES 11cv274
05/25/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv275
05/25/2011RECORD COPIES 11cv275
05/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
08/08/2011FiledBrief (No Appdx) (Appellant)
08/17/2011FiledOrder directing appellee to file the brief on or before September 12, 2011.
09/12/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Columbia Storage Management LLC, Appellee H. Street Self-Storag LLc., Appellee Roberts, Appellee Self Storage Services Inc.)
10/03/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
07/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Beckwith and Easterly, Associate Judges and King, Senior Judge)
08/03/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Denied
10/16/2012FiledOrder Denying the petition for rehearing.
10/25/2012FiledMandate