judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DECRAEMER VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33578
Short Caption:DECRAEMER VS. 8TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A358030Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Turner & Curriden--check no. 4404.
01/08/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for a Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. 99-00125
01/08/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay Pending Determination of Petition for Special Writs. 99-00126
01/15/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Determination of Petition for Special Writs (no postmark). 99-00286
02/01/1999MotionReceived Reply to Response. Petitioner's Reply to Rebecca Gonzales' Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Determiantion of Petition for Special Writs (mailed on: 01/27/99). 99-00663
02/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 1, 1999, petitioners submitted a reply. Petitioners not having obtained permission to file a reply, the clerk shall return, unfiled, petitioners' reply. 99-00798
02/04/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned unfiled with letter to the Barker firm: original copy of Reply to Response to Motion. 99-00663
02/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. We grant petitioners' motion for a stay and temporarily stay the district court proceedings until further order of this court. 99-00799
02/25/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. (FedEx 2/24/99) 99-01287
03/08/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion to File a Reply to the Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative Writ of Mandamus. 99-01606
03/11/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petitioners Motion to file a Reply to Respondent's Opposition. 99-01755
08/10/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we grant this petition." The clerk of this court shall forthwith issue a writ of prohibition. fn1[We grant petitioners' motion to file a reply to the answer, and we direct the clerk to file the reply, which was submitted to this court on March 8, 1999]. 99-07337
08/10/1999Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner's Reply to the opposition to the Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the alternative Writ of Mandamus. 99-07338
08/10/1999WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Karl H. Smith for service upon Judge Gene T. Porter. 99-07393
08/16/1999WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Porter on August 13, 1999. 99-07393
09/08/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-08433
09/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.