judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

PEDRO DEL BOSQUE v. HEITMAN BERING-CORTES COMPANY

Case: B-2862
B-2862
07/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
PEDRO DEL BOSQUE
HEITMAN BERING-CORTES COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/29/1971Letter brief Respondent
11/24/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/22/1971Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/28/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/15/1971Opinion issued
11/29/1971Letter brief
11/24/1971Response to Brief filed
11/22/1971Supplemental Brief filed
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/28/1971Response to Petition
07/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/14/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pedro Del BosquePetitioner
Heitman Bering-Cortes CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information