judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE ESTATE OF YOUNG

Case Information: 29668
Short Caption:IN RE ESTATE OF YOUNGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P36092Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/23/1999How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/1996Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hyrum B. Cox, Check No. 3780.
12/05/1996Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 4. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Document no. 96-01498.
12/05/1996ExhibitReceived Exhibit (original). Exhibits: Petitioner's 1 through 4, 4A, 5 through 12, 12A, 13 and 13A; Respondent's A through D. Document no. 96-01498.
12/05/1996ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Placed in correspondence file. Document no. 96-01499.
12/20/1996Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Document no. 96-01933.
01/15/1997MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Document no. 97-00391.
01/21/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before February 14, 1997. Resolves document no. 97-00391.
02/19/1997BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on 2/14/97.
03/06/1997MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 4/14/97.
04/14/1997BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 4/11/97.
05/15/1997BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 5/13/97.
03/29/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney George Holt regarding status of case. 99-02277
04/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Mailed letter to attorney George E. Holt in response to his letter received on 03/39/99 (cc: counsel).
05/04/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. 99-03584
07/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. September 23, 1999 at the hour of 2:00 p.m. - 1/2 hr. (SNP-WM, MS, NB)
09/08/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Errata. 99-11106
09/23/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
10/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
11/10/1999Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing of Order (by panel) Dismissing Appeal or in the alternative, for clarification of such order. 99-11115
11/10/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Hyrum B. Cox-check no. 5157.
12/17/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12856
01/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 4 and Exhibits: Petitioner's 1 through 4, 4A, 5 through 12, 12A, 13 and 13 A; Respondent's A through D. 00-00078
01/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2000. 00-00078