judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHESTER DARRAL FLETCHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0258)
Case Number:S-09-0258Case Docketed On:12/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CHESTER DARRAL FLETCHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHESTER DARRAL FLETCHER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChester Darral FletcherDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Mental Health/Commitments
Opinion Number:2010 WY 167
Citation:245 P.3d 327

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/29/2010Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
01/29/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/17/2010Order - Denying Motion for Partial RemandOrderDenyFinal
03/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/29/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from district court clerk's office indicating that the record may be delayed due to illness.EventPhone CallFinal
05/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/26/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/16/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/21/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/10/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal