judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEPHEN JAMES LARREW V. HONORABLE KEITH SELF, ET AL

Case Information: 11-OA-0007
Short Caption:STEPHEN JAMES LARREW V. HONORABLE KEITH SELF, ET ALClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC796-09Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerStephen James Larrew NPro SeN
RespondentSelf, KeithNPro SeN
RespondentJim Foster NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS & OF PROHIBITION (no IFP attached) lw Denied
03/11/2011TMC - petition for writ of mandamus
03/18/2011FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/18/2011ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (RDKRTE)
04/08/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
04/11/2011RECEIVED Appellant's response to court's order dated 3/18/11 and request for clarification.
04/12/2011TMC - motion for reconsideration
04/26/2011 ORDERED that MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (RDKRTE)