judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTISSIN L. WHITTERN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0012)
Case Number:S-10-0012Case Docketed On:01/11/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Weapons 6-8-101 - 6-8-401
Short Title:MATTISSIN L. WHITTERN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTISSIN L. WHITTERN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMattissin L. WhitternDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/11/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/26/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/03/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/05/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal