judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIKE (CORDELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33595
Short Caption:MIKE (CORDELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7319Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00170
01/12/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. December 28, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Cherl A. Belden. 99-00171
01/28/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00610
01/28/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-00611
02/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00938
06/10/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-04925
07/07/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-05974
07/07/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/13/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 1999. 99-05974