judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BALCH (FRANK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33594
Short Caption:BALCH (FRANK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR4929Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00169
01/29/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [We have considerd all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is now warranted.] NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. 99-00642
02/23/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01196
02/23/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/26/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 25, 1999 99-01196