judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD JOHN WINSTED v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0011)
Case Number:S-10-0011Case Docketed On:01/11/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Weapons 6-8-101 - 6-8-401
Short Title:RICHARD JOHN WINSTED v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD JOHN WINSTED, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard John WinstedH. Michael Bennett
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Craig C. Cook
Anna C. Swain

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2010 WY 139
Citation:241 P.3d 497

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/11/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2010Brief - Appellant; and Statement of Costs.BriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/08/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Craig C. Cook and Anna C. Swain to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
04/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Apellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/27/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/04/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folders.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/25/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
10/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/17/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/15/2010ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal