judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY LOPEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0296
Short Caption:ANTHONY LOPEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD14172-09Filed Date:03/01/2011

Opening Event Date:03/01/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Lopez Y
Kevin McCantsNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/17/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED... (BY: ETW)
03/17/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/31/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
04/07/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Titled as: Motion for Show Cause to Stay Appeal - duplicate of ROTSC filed 3/31/11)
04/26/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY filed but w/o prejudice to appellant filing a motion to reinstate if the trial court grants the motion for an extension of time to file the appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall...transmit a copy of the NOA and the response to the order to show cause to the Clerk of Superior Court to be filed as a motion for an extension of time to file the NOA pursuant to DC App. R. 4(b)(1). (THKNTE)
04/26/2011DISMISSED
05/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED