judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BASTARDO VS. EICON

Case Information: 33588
Short Caption:BASTARDO VS. EICONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A385761Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/05/1999 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00139
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/28/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00613
02/01/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Request for another settlement judge to hear this matter. 99-00687
02/05/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler.
06/14/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 25, 1999. 99-05119
07/09/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 30, 1999. 99-06112
08/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-07209
09/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have tentatively agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 99-08348
01/31/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01545
02/14/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-02276
02/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-02771
06/15/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 6/12/00. 00-10181
06/15/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 5. 00-10182
07/12/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/11/00. 00-11973
08/10/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 8/8/00. 00-13907
09/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] " . . . we reverse the district court's order and remand with instructions for the district court to (1) grant the petition for judicial review and (2) remand the matter to the administrative agency for recalculation of the proper monthly deductions under NRS 616C.440(4)." fn2[In support of a request that this court dismiss the appeal as moot, respondent attached to its answering brief a copy of the Stipulation Regarding Settlement and Dismissal that it offered during the settlement conference. We caution respondent that if it submits similar prohibited documents in the future, we will not hesitate to impose sanctionss for violation of this court's rules.] fn3[In any case in which respondent has also made deductions from Temporary Total Disability benefits to recoup previously paid PPD lumb sum awards, the administrative agency must consider the effect of the additional deductions in its calculations.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-15707
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15799
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2000. 00-15799