judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY LEE RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0005)
Case Number:S-10-0005Case Docketed On:01/08/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:GARY LEE RODRIGUEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GARY LEE RODRIGUEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Lee RodriguezDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/08/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/25/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
02/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/26/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/26/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal