judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAMIEN EVANS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0285
Short Caption:DAMIEN EVANS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF18227-10Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDamien Evans NPro SeN
AppellantDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/21/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION since an associate judge's review of a magistrate judge's decision is a prerequisite for appeal. (BY: ETW)
03/21/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/01/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's)
04/26/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HERERBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. D.C. Code 11-1732 (k)(2001). (THKNTE)
04/26/2011DISMISSED
04/27/2011RECEIVED - SR #1 (41pgs/Tape)--2/14/10 proc.
04/27/2011RECEIVED - SR #2 (58pgs/Tape)--2/15/10 proc.
04/27/2011RECEIVED - SR #3 (57pgs/Tape)--2/16/10 proc. w/CD
04/27/2011RECEIVED - Record Index
04/27/2011RECEIVED - Record copies
05/06/2011RECEIVED - Pro Se Response to Order to Show Cause (transmitted by ltr from trial court judge chambers)
05/10/2011RECEIVED - aplt's response to show cause order dated 3/21/11