judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WILLIAM DONALD KELLEY, ET AL. v. TEXAS STATE BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS

Case: B-2844
B-2844
07/08/1971
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM DONALD KELLEY, ET AL.
TEXAS STATE BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/21/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/10/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/22/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/08/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/09/1971Motion to Stay Filed
10/21/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/10/1971Supplemental Brief filed
07/22/1971Response to Petition
07/08/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/08/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William Donald Kelley, et al.Petitioner
Texas State Board of Medical Examiners Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information