judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HILL (PAUL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33587
Short Caption:HILL (PAUL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37098
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C97873Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00138
01/11/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
02/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: fn1 [We consolidate these cases for disposition.] "ORDER these appeals dismissed." Nos. 33586, 33587. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-00736
03/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01433
03/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/24/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 1999. 99-01434