judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES P. WUNSCH v. KELLY M. PICKERING, f/k/a KELLY M. WUNSCH

Case Heading (S-10-0004)
Case Number:S-10-0004Case Docketed On:01/07/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JAMES P. WUNSCH v. KELLY M. PICKERING, f/k/a KELLY M. WUNSCH
Full Title:JAMES P. WUNSCH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KELLY M. PICKERING, f/k/a KELLY M. WUNSCH, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames P. WunschMatthew R. Giacomini
Andrew Burch Reid
AppelleeKelly M. PickeringLea Jacobs Kuvinka

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Civil Procedure, Contracts, Marriage and Divorce
Opinion Number:2011 WY 59
Citation:249 P.3d 717

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/07/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/07/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Amended Notice of AppealNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution (Entry of Appearance - Matthew R. Giacomini for Appellant)Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
02/19/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/19/2010Motion - Other - Withdrawal of CounselMotionOtherFinal
02/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for withdrawal of attorneysEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel (Colin M. Simpson and Larry B. Jones allowed to withdraw)OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of AppearanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended index from district court clerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/22/2010Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
03/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew B. ReidEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2010Order - Pro hac vice - allow (Check included with hardcopies of motion returned with copy of order)OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
03/24/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/25/2010Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
03/25/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
03/25/2010Response/Objection - Motion to DismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
03/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Remand for Further Proceedings. Pleadings sent in two packages, one delayed in mailEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received Appellant's Response to Appllee's Motion to Dismiss; Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion to Dismiss; Response to Appellant's Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/26/2010Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
03/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Remand for Further Proceedings. (Second package)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - response to motion to remand.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2010Response/Objection - Other - Reply to response to motion for remand.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
04/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for RemandEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2010Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal, Order Denying Motion for Remand and Order Granting Appellant's Motion for Extension of TimeOrderDenyFinal
05/10/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/11/2010Response/Objection - ExtensionResponse/ObjectionExtensionFinal
05/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to Correct the RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's response to appellant's motion for extension of time to correct record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/17/2010Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
05/17/2010Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
05/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Correct the Record and Motion to Support RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended index, Addendum to Second AmendedNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/21/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's response to appellant's motion to supplement the recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2010Order - Grant - extension of time and Order, Granting, In Part, Motion to Supplement the Record (No further extensions of time)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended index, Second Addendum to Second Amended Docket IndexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/10/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's request for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/12/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/16/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2010Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
09/03/2010Order - Granting motion to supplement record and for one-week extension of timeOrderGrantFinal
09/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to supplement record and for one week extension of time; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended index (Third)Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
09/09/2010Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/27/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts, Financial Affidavits & Attachments; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lea Kuvinka for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/11/2010Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellant regarding oral argument - Mr. Reid will argue on behalf of appellant.EventPhone CallFinal
10/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Matthew R. Giacomini and Andrew Reid for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Matthew R. Giacomini and Andrew Burch Reid, argument by Mr. Reid for appellant; Lea Jacobs Kuvinka for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/12/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal