judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES R. ALLEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0284
Short Caption:JAMES R. ALLEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Lead: 09-CF-0407 Consolidated:11-CO-0284
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17982-07Filed Date:03/04/2011

Opening Event Date:03/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames R. Allen Y
Thomas D. EngleNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/30/2011ORDERED that appellant's motion to file the lodged status statement is granted, and the Clerk shall file the lodged status statement. F/O that appellant's motion to stay is denied as moot. F/O, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 09-CF-407 and 11-CO-284 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Thomas Engle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CO-284 herein. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 11-CO-284 to this court forthwith. F/O that appellant's consolidated brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
03/30/2011STMT/STATUS REPORT RE PENDING TRIAL COURT MOTION in appeal no. 09-CF-407
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX (11CO284)
04/12/2011RECORD COPIES (11CO284)
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
05/12/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
06/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/13/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's brief.
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
07/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to 8/17/11. (Appellee)
08/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/17/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/14/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Easterly, Farrell Thomas D. Engle, Esq. for appellant Michelle Parikh Brown, Esq. for appellee
04/02/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver. (Appellant)Granted
04/06/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to withdraw appeal.
04/06/2012FiledDismissed
04/30/2012FiledMandate