judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMPSON VS. SHERWIN-WILLIAMS

Case Information: 33596
Short Caption:THOMPSON VS. SHERWIN-WILLIAMSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9701085AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/1999 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from R. Trent McAuliffe--check no. 3476.
01/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00181
01/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/25/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00465
01/25/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-00466
01/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 99-00651
04/05/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-02532
04/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. 99-02719
04/09/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.